EP0081518 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ROTATIONAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.1983 [1983/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinnersly, Richard Furneaux Bramfield Slab Lane West Wellow Nr. Romsey Hants SO5 0BY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states Kinnersly, Richard Furneaux Bramfield Slab Lane West Wellow Nr. Romsey Hants SO5 0BY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82901727.6 | 14.06.1982 | [1983/25] | WO1982GB00178 | Priority number, date | GB19810018236 | 13.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8118236 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8204469 | Date: | 23.12.1982 | [1982/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081518 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F16H35/08, G09F11/02, A63G27/02, F16M11/12 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
F16M11/2028 (EP);
A63G27/02 (EP);
F16H35/08 (EP);
F16M11/105 (EP);
G09F11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | DREHGERÄT | [1983/25] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ROTATIONAL DEVICES | [1983/25] | French: | AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES DISPOSITIFS ROTATIFS | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 10.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/47] | 10.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.03.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 14.03.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.06.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2934341 ; | [X]DE2627554 ; | [X]US2328852 ; | [X]US2864615 ; | [X]DE182192 ; | [X]US2437000 ; | [X]DE434070 ; | [A]US3287981 ; | [A]US2389826 ; | [A]GB191219198 ; | [A]FR677712 ; | [A]FR825912 |