EP0078311 - DILATION CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOGARTY, Thomas J. 770 Welch Road Suite 201 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [1983/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIN, Albert K. 1280 - 7th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 82901820.9 | 06.05.1982 | [1983/19] | WO1982US00606 | Priority number, date | US19810263776 | 14.05.1981 Original published format: US 263776 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203989 | Date: | 25.11.1982 | [1982/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078311 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078311 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61M25/0119 (EP,US);
A61M25/1002 (EP,US);
A61M25/1011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/19] | Title | German: | AUSDEHNBARER KATHETER | [1983/19] | English: | DILATION CATHETER | [1983/19] | French: | CATHETER DE DILATATION | [1983/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1982 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1982 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 13.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US4202346 [ ] (GRANIER PIERRE M [FR]); | GB2054385 [ ] (FOGARTY T J) | International search | US2493326 [ ] (TRINDER JOHN H); | US2912981 [ ] (KEOUGH FRANK J); | US3766924 [ ] (PIDGEON R); | US3896815 [ ] (FETTEL BRUCE E, et al); | US4254774 [ ] (BORETOS JOHN W) | Examination | US3435826 |