EP0084548 - DEVICE FOR THE PRESSURELESS ACCUMULATION OF LOADS ON ROLLER CONVEYORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAFFRE, Félicien Samovie, rue du Commandant Le Prieur, Kéryado F-56100 Lorient / FR | [1983/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/31] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82902352.2 | 27.07.1982 | [1983/31] | WO1982FR00129 | Priority number, date | FR19810015009 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: FR 8115009 | [1983/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300479 | Date: | 17.02.1983 | [1983/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084548 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084548 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26 | [1983/31] | CPC: |
B65G47/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1983/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM STAUDRUCKLOSEN SAMMELN VON ARTIKELN AUF EINEM ROLLENFÖRDERER | [1983/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE PRESSURELESS ACCUMULATION OF LOADS ON ROLLER CONVEYORS | [1983/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ACCUMULATION SANS PRESSION DE CHARGES SUR TRANSPORTEURS A ROULEAUX | [1983/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1983 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 24.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2214168 (FROMME FOERDERANLAGEN GMBH); | [X]FR2297793 (LECHEVALLIER MAURICE [FR]); | [A]DE2805036 (ENZINGER UNION WERKE AG); | [X]CH616385 (STOECKLIN WALTER AG [CH]) |