EP0086797 - REFLECTANCE METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGG PTY. LIMITED 21 Mooramba Road Dee Why, N.S.W. 2099 / AU | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Stanley 21 Mooramba Road Dee Why, N.S.W. 2099 / AU | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Brookes & Martin High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London. WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82902517.0 | 26.08.1982 | [1983/35] | WO1982AU00141 | Priority number, date | AU19810000477 | 28.08.1981 Original published format: AU 47781 | [1983/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300926 | Date: | 17.03.1983 | [1983/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0086797 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086797 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/01, G01N21/27, G01J3/46 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
F16H7/1236 (EP,US);
G01N21/474 (EP);
G01N21/8483 (EP);
F16H2007/0806 (EP);
F16H2007/0859 (EP);
F16H2007/0891 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | REFLEKTOMETER | [1987/17] | English: | REFLECTANCE METER | [1983/35] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE MESURE DE LA REFLECTANCE | [1983/35] |
Former [1983/35] | WIDERSPIEGELUNGSMETER | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1983 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1983 | Search fee paid | 27.04.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 20.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.04.1987 | [1989/18] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4268173 (BARNARD WILLIAM R, et al) | International search | [X]US3604815 (CLEMENS ANTON HUBERT); | [P]DE3026439 (SIGMA INSTR GMBH [DE]) | Examination | US3907503 |