EP0088100 - CLAMPING DEVICE TO FORM SUPPORTS FOR FORMING DIES IN AN INJECTION PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ludwig Engel KG Ludwig-Engel-Strasse 1 A-4311 Schwertberg / AT | [1983/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Georg Friedhofstrasse 21 A-4311 Schwertberg / AT | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Paul Torggler Dr. Engelbert Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 82902702.8 | 09.09.1982 | [1983/37] | WO1982AT00026 | Priority number, date | AT19810003955 | 14.09.1981 Original published format: AT 395581 | AT19810003956 | 14.09.1981 Original published format: AT 395681 | [1983/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301038 | Date: | 31.03.1983 | [1983/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088100 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088100 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/26 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
B29C45/1743 (EP,US);
B29C33/305 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/37] | B29F1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE FORMWERKZEUGE EINER SPRITZGIESSMACHINE AN FORMTRÄGERN | [1983/37] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE TO FORM SUPPORTS FOR FORMING DIES IN AN INJECTION PRESS | [1983/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION AUX SUPPORTS DE FORME POUR LES MATRICES DE FORMAGE D'UNE PRESSE D'INJECTION | [1983/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1983 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/37] | 15.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1986
03.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE Arburg Maschinenfabrik Hehl & Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32 D-72290 Lossburg / DE Opponent's representative Mayer, Friedrich E., et al, et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1986
03.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE Arburg Maschinenfabrik Hehl & Söhne GmbH & Co. KG Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32 D-72290 Lossburg / DE Opponent's representative Mayer, Friedrich, Dr., et al, et al Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | 29.04.1986 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 28.05.1986 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.07.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.11.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.08.1987 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.03.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/31] | Appeal following opposition | 05.10.1987 | Appeal received No. T0342/87 | 16.12.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.03.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0025995 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]); | [Y]DE2947938 (VER FOERDERUNG INST KUNSTSTOFF [DE]); | [A]DE2253451 (HYDRON INC); | [A]CA1015639 (VICEROY FLUID POWER LIMITED, et al); | [A]DE2724020 (NETSTAL AG MASCHF GIESSEREI) |