EP0099888 - INSULATED COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1984/06] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, Vincent Glenwood, Jr. 3 Michael Road Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [1984/06] | Representative(s) | Voigt, Reinhard, et al Patentanwalt, Pfarrgasse 51 65239 Hochheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/06] | Voigt, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Elsterweg 22 D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82902771.3 | 04.08.1982 | [1984/06] | WO1982US01056 | Priority number, date | US19820344210 | 29.01.1982 Original published format: US 344210 | [1984/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302650 | Date: | 04.08.1983 | [1983/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099888 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099888 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/00 | [1984/06] | CPC: |
F16D1/06 (EP,US);
F16D1/00 (KR);
H02K7/003 (EP,US);
F16B2200/503 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7021 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/06] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE KUPPLUNG | [1984/06] | English: | INSULATED COUPLING | [1984/06] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT ISOLE | [1984/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1983 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1983 | Search fee paid | 18.08.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/14] | 02.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1145672 ; | [X]US2956187 ; | [X]DE3131129 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH [DE]) | International search | [A]US2452458 (HAHN CLARENCE J); | [A]US2676279 (WILSON CHARLES D); | [A]US2937042 (WILDER JR STUART); | [A]US3457438 (BADCOCK DAVID NORMAN WILLIAM); | [X]US3797960 (MC CARTHY D); | [A]US4028909 (JANCIC GOJKO, et al); | [X]US4083639 (TERRY VINCENT G) |