EP0090026 - CACHE MEMORY USING A LOWEST PRIORITY REPLACEMENT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1989 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1983/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Shih-Jeh 1308 Deep Run Road Naperville, IL 60540 / US | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Brian Richard, et al Western Electric Company Limited 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Lawrence, Brian Richard, et al Western Electric Company Limited 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82903202.8 | 22.09.1982 | [1983/40] | WO1982US01294 | Priority number, date | US19810307857 | 02.10.1981 Original published format: US 307857 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301323 | Date: | 14.04.1983 | [1983/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090026 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090026 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/12, G06F12/08 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
G06F12/123 (EP,US);
G06F12/0897 (EP,US);
G06F12/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/40] | G06F13/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1983/40] | Title | German: | CACHE-SPEICHER MIT GEBRAUCH EINER ERSATZSCHALTUNG NIEDRIGSTER PRIORITÄT | [1983/40] | English: | CACHE MEMORY USING A LOWEST PRIORITY REPLACEMENT CIRCUIT | [1983/40] | French: | ANTEMEMOIRE UTILISANT UN CIRCUIT DE REMPLACEMENT A PRIORITE MOINDRE | [1983/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1983 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1983 | Search fee paid | 25.05.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 07.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3911401 (LEE HUA-TUNG); | [Y]US4020466 (CORDI VINCENT ANTHONY, et al) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 6, November 1978, pages 2468-2469, New York, US; F.J. SPARACIO: "Data processing system with second level cache" | International search | [A]US3820078 (FRANKLIN B, et al); | [A]US3949368 (WEST JOSEPH THOMAS); | [A]US4008460 (BRYANT LOUIS R, et al); | [A]US4157587 (HOLTEY THOMAS O [US], et al); | [A]US4161024 (JOYCE THOMAS F, et al); | [A]US4195342 (HOLTEY THOMAS O [US], et al); | [A]US4197580 (CHANG SHIH-JEH [US], et al) |