EP0120840 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BANDAGING A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) One Baxter Parkway Deerfield Illinois 60015 / US | ||
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORPORATION One American Plaza Evanston, IL 60201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSMANN, Frederic 920 Larchmont Lane Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | 02 /
SIMS, Larry A. 435 Second Street Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 / US | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Seaborn, George Stephen, et al Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | Seaborn, George Stephen, et al c/o Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 82903221.8 | 28.09.1982 | [1984/41] | WO1982US01347 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401285 | Date: | 12.04.1984 | [1984/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120840 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120840 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
A61F15/005 (EP);
A61B46/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/41] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINES PATIENTEN | [1984/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BANDAGING A PATIENT | [1984/41] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE BANDAGE D'UN PATIENT | [1984/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1983 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1983 | Search fee paid | 22.06.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 04.10.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 20.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 29.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1989
13.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Smith & Nephew plc 2 Temple Place Victoria Embankment GB - London WC2R 3BP / GB Opponent's representative Cole, William Gwyn Corporate Patents Department Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1989
13.02.1990
ADMISSIBLE Smith & Nephew plc 2 Temple Place Victoria Embankment GB - London WC2R 3BP / GB Opponent's representative Cole, William Gwyn Corporate Patents Department Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | 16.02.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.08.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.04.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M01) | 17.04.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.12.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/22] | 30.12.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 04.06.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1992/33] | CH | 22.03.1989 | |
LI | 22.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0051935 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | EP0066899 [ ] (MUCHIN JEROME D); | US4374520 [ ] (GROSSMANN FREDERIC, et al) | International search | [A]US3236370 (LOUIS PERENY, et al); | [A]US3349765 (BLANFORD WILLIAM F); | [A]US4080963 (MERRY JACK D, et al) |