EP0094971 - SOUND GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARIMA, Masanori 13-4, Tenmadai Higashi 4-chome Haibaracho Uda-gun Nara-ken 633-02 / JP | 02 /
OHSHIMA, Kohsho 376, Tsutsuicho Yamotokoriyama-shi Nara-ken 639-11 / JP | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82903471.9 | 24.11.1982 | [1983/48] | WO1982JP00449 | Priority number, date | JP19810189731 | 25.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18973181 | [1983/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302030 | Date: | 09.06.1983 | [1983/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094971 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094971 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G10K9/22, H04R17/10 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
G10K9/122 (EP,US);
G10K9/22 (EP,US);
H10N30/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1983/48] | Title | German: | SCHALLGENERATOR | [1983/48] | English: | SOUND GENERATOR | [1983/48] | French: | GENERATEUR SONORE | [1983/48] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1983 | Translation filed | 22.07.1983 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1983 | Search fee paid | 22.07.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4006371 (QUIRKE PATRIC C); | [Y]US4190783 (MASSA FRANK [US]); | [A]GB2029160 (AMERICAN DISTRICT TELEGRAPH CO); | [A]DE2912609 (MEHNE GMBH J G) | International search | [Y]GB1368046 (MALLORY & CO INC P R); | [Y]JPS5136374U ; | [Y]JPS54160580U ; | [X]JPS54144895 (SEIKOSHA KK); | [Y]JPS5529435U ; | [Y]JPS5586295 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) | Examination | JPS5136374U | JPS5529435U | JPS5586295 |