EP0094957 - CHICKEN WEIGHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANQUET FOODS CORPORATION 304 Vine Street Macon MO 63552 / US | [1983/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORDAN, C. Wane R.R. No. 3 Macon, MO 63551 / US | 02 /
WALKER, John W. 1128 Rustic Drive Macon, MO 63552 / US | [1983/48] | Application number, filing date | 82903567.4 | 27.10.1982 | [1983/48] | WO1982US01517 | Priority number, date | US19810325828 | 30.11.1981 Original published format: US 325828 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302002 | Date: | 09.06.1983 | [1983/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094957 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/48] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01G13/24, G01G19/00, B65B57/10 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
G01G19/393 (EP,US);
G01G13/2906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1983/48] | Title | German: | WIEGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR HÄHNCHEN | [1983/48] | English: | CHICKEN WEIGHING APPARATUS | [1983/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE PESAGE DE POULETS | [1983/48] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/20] | 07.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.09.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.09.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 01.09.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 01.09.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 01.09.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.12.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2470916 (HUNTER CARRUTHERS EBEN); | [Y]US2802658 (HENSGEN BERNARD T, et al); | [A]US3073399 (DURAND FRED A); | [A]US3311182 (RUSNACK MICHAEL E, et al); | [A]US3416620 (MCCLUSKY STANLEY A); | [A]US3416619 (MCCLUSKY STANLEY A); | [Y]US3620317 (HENRY NELSON R); | [A]US3708025 (SOLER F, et al); | [A]US3714401 (YANO Y); | [Y]US3939928 (MURAKAMI KATSUHIKO, et al); | [A]US3945448 (SELLERS KENNETH W); | [A]US3959636 (JOHNSON BERNARD A, et al); | [Y]US3977483 (GREANIAS JAMES G); | [Y]US4065911 (FAGAN JOHN C); | [A]US4123970 (QUANTE SIEGFRIED); | [Y]US4206822 (MAZZUCCHELLI PEPPINO [IT]) | [A] - Heat and Control News, issued November1981 |