EP0084319 - Process for drying and removing hydrocarbons from or of gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEB Chemieanlagenbaukombinat Leipzig-Grimma Bahnhofstrasse 3-5 DDR-7240 Grimma / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states VEB Chemieanlagenbaukombinat Leipzig-Grimma Bahnhofstrasse 3-5 DDR-7240 Grimma / DD | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlicht, Burkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Lehnestrasse 31 DDR-1138 Berlin / DD | 02 /
Sonntag, Christel, Dipl.-Ing. Werner-Lamberzstrasse 86 DDR-1136 Berlin / DD | 03 /
Beise, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Schieritzstrasse 19 DDR-1055 Berlin / DD | 04 /
Lindner, Otto Hagedornstrasse 54 DDR-1197 Berlin / DD | 05 /
Wehner, Klaus, Dr. rer.nat. Hocker Gasse 1 DDR-4220 Leuna / DD | 06 /
Burk, Werner, Dr. rer.nat. Block 247 DDR-4090 Halle-Neustadt / DD | 07 /
Gross, Manfred, Dr. rer.nat. Strasse der Einheit 17 DDR-9200 Freiberg / DD | 08 /
Minak, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Am Seilerberg 23 DD-9200 Freiberg / DD | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100037.7 | 04.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | DD19470002368 | 19.01.1982 Original published format: DD 236847 | [1983/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084319 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084319 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084319 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, C07C7/11, C10K1/16 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C10K1/14 (EP,US);
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D53/263 (EP,US);
C10K1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trocknung und Entfernung von Kohlenwasserstoffen aus bzw. von Gasen | [1983/30] | English: | Process for drying and removing hydrocarbons from or of gases | [1983/30] | French: | Procédé de séchage et d'élimination d'hydrocarbures des gaz | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/06] | 08.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2341643 (CHEMIE TANKANLAGENBAU VEB K [DD]); | [Y]DD128319 (WEHNER KLAUS, et al) |