EP0084331 - Controlled floating contactor switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mechanical Enterprises, Inc. 461 Carlisle Drive Herndon Virginia 22070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states Mechanical Enterprises, Inc. 461 Carlisle Drive Herndon Virginia 22070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Twyford, Robert H. 10216 Eisenhower Lane Great Falls Virginia 22066 / US | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [1983/30] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Ruhrstrasse 26 Postfach 2448 D-58414 Witten / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100091.4 | 07.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | US19820340366 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: US 340366 | US19820450227 | 16.12.1982 Original published format: US 450227 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084331 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084331 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/20, H01H1/64 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
H01H1/20 (EP,US);
H01H1/64 (EP,US);
Y10S200/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/30] | Title | German: | Schalter mit schwebendem betätigten Kontaktorgan | [1985/33] | English: | Controlled floating contactor switch | [1983/30] | French: | Interrupteur à élément contacteur flottant commandé | [1983/30] |
Former [1983/30] | Schalter mit bedientem flotierendem Kontaktorgan | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 09.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.08.1985 | FR | 14.08.1985 | IT | 14.08.1985 | LI | 14.08.1985 | SE | 30.08.1985 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 14.08.1985 | |
IT | 14.08.1985 | ||
LI | 14.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
Former [1989/19] | CH | 14.08.1985 | |
LI | 14.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | SE | 30.08.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE514238 ; | [A]US2195199 (BECKER HENRY E); | [Y]US2238312 (ALLIE EDMONSTON); | [Y]BE670925 ; | [A]US3342965 (WERNER BOSCH); | [A]GB1151331 (WESTWOOD SWITCHGEAR LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]US3569649 (SPIELBAUER ARNOLD A); | [A]US3654407 (KEPNER THEODORE S, et al) |