EP0084335 - Apparatus for quenching molten metal or an alloy on a belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/30] | Process and apparatus for quenching molten metal or an alloy on a belt | ||
[1985/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1986 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. 91, Avenue de la Libération 54017 Nancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. 91, Avenue de la Libération F-54017 Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fournier, Pascal 7 rue de l'Oratoire F-54000 Nancy / FR | 02 /
Peraud, Jean-Claude 10/12 rue Paul Doumer F-94520 Perigny sur Yerres / FR | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Puit, Thierry, et al Pont-à-Mousson S.A. Service de Propriété Industrielle Boîte Postale 109 F-54704 Pont-à-MoussonCedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | Puit, Thierry, et al Pont-à-Mousson S.A. Service de Propriété Industrielle Boîte Postale 109 F-54704 Pont-à-MoussonCedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83100114.4 | 08.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | FR19820000664 | 18.01.1982 Original published format: FR 8200664 | [1983/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084335 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084335 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084335 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
B22D11/0685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum schnellen Abschrecken eines flüssigen Metalles oder einer Metallegierung auf einem Band | [1985/33] | English: | Apparatus for quenching molten metal or an alloy on a belt | [1985/33] | French: | Dispositif d'hypertrempe sur bande d'un métal ou d'un alliage métallique liquide | [1985/33] |
Former [1983/30] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum schnellen Abschrecken eines flüssigen Metalles oder einer Metallegierung auf einem Band | ||
Former [1983/30] | Process and apparatus for quenching molten metal or an alloy on a belt | ||
Former [1983/30] | Procédé et dispositif de trempe rapide sur bande d'un métal ou d'un alliage métallique liquide | Examination procedure | 13.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 26.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4221257 ; | [Y]FR2289273 |