EP0088210 - Slide switch for electric tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.11.1989 [1989/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl M. Reich, Maschinenfabrik GmbH Postfach 17 40 72607 Nürtingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states Karl M. Reich, Maschinenfabrik GmbH Postfach 17 40 D-72607 Nürtingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Klaus Brunnenweg 4 D-7440 Nürtingen / DE | [1983/37] | Application number, filing date | 83100264.7 | 14.01.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | DE19823201744 | 21.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3201744 | [1983/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088210 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088210 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088210 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/06 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
B23B45/001 (EP);
H01H9/06 (EP);
H01H11/0006 (EP);
H01H13/62 (EP);
H01H2300/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | Schaltschieber für Elektrowerkzeuge | [1983/37] | English: | Slide switch for electric tools | [1983/37] | French: | Interrupteur à coulisse pour outils électriques | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 02.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.11.1987 | SE | 30.11.1987 | AT | 14.01.1988 | [1989/46] |
Former [1989/21] | BE | 19.11.1987 | |
SE | 30.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 19.11.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3662136 (BIENWALD WOLFGANG F, et al); | [A]FR2223965 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE2929320 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP); | [A]FR2444329 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]GB2044536 (BLACK & DECKER INC) |