Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3363451D1 | 19.06.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3218909 | 19.05.1982 | DE3363451 | 26.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0094475 | Global Dossier | 14.05.1986 | B1 | EP0094475 | 01.08.1984 | A3 | EP0094475 | 23.11.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3218909 | 19.05.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3218909 | 24.11.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3218909 | 19.05.1982 |