EP0094475 - Non linear transmission circuit for the position of the gas pedal in a truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1987 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1987 [1987/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1983/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collonia, Harald Zum Talblick 12 D-6246 Glashütten/Ts / DE | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Könekamp, Herbert Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Könekamp, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100685.3 | 26.01.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | DE19823218909 | 19.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3218909 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094475 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094475 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094475 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60K26/04, F02D11/10, F02D33/02 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
B60K26/04 (EP);
F02D11/105 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/32] | B60K26/04, F02D33/02, F02D33/02 | ||
Former IPC [1983/47] | F02D11/10, F02D33/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/47] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur nicht linearen Übertragung des einer Fahrpedalstellung eines Kraftfahrzeuges entsprechenden Sollwertsignals | [1983/47] | English: | Non linear transmission circuit for the position of the gas pedal in a truck | [1983/47] | French: | Circuit de transmission non-linéaire de la position de la pédale d'accélérateur pour camion | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 16.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3707950 (SCHLIMME E); | [X]US3407793 (HERBERT LANG); | [XP]US4280465 (STAERZL RICHARD E); | [A]US3709626 (EGGENBERGER M); | [A]DE2635759 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]FR2343622 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2385553 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) | Examination | - VDO-Querschnitt, März 1981, Frankfurt (DE), S. 1-19 |