blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0098909

EP0098909 - Idling speed controller, in particular for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.1988
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.1988 [1988/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Gräfstrasse 103
D-60487 Frankfurt / DE
[1984/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Collonia, Harald
Zum Talblick 12
D-6246 Glashütten / DE
[1984/04]
Representative(s)Könekamp, Herbert
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/04]Könekamp, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing.
Sodener Strasse 9
D-65824 Schwalbach / DE
Application number, filing date83100686.126.01.1983
[1984/04]
Priority number, dateDE1982322628314.07.1982         Original published format: DE 3226283
[1984/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0098909
Date:25.01.1984
Language:DE
[1984/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0098909
Date:25.07.1984
Language:DE
[1984/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0098909
Date:27.05.1987
Language:DE
[1987/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1984
ClassificationIPC:G05D13/62, F02D31/00
[1984/04]
CPC:
F02D31/004 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1984/04]
TitleGerman:Leerlaufregler, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge[1984/04]
English:Idling speed controller, in particular for vehicles[1984/04]
French:Régulateur de ralenti notamment pour les véhicules[1984/04]
Examination procedure29.08.1984Examination requested  [1984/45]
05.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.12.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.1987Fee for grant paid
24.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2007878  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT);
 [A]GB2064173  (SNECMA);
 [A]US4031483  (FORMEISTER RICHARD B);
 [E]DE3149097  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.