EP0086378 - Method of plasma-coating the inside surface of a glass tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/34] | Method of plasma-coating the inside surface of a glass tube | ||
[1983/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
International Standard Electric Corporation 320 Park Avenue New York New York 10022 / US | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
International Standard Electric Corporation 320 Park Avenue New York New York 10022 / US | ||
For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | |||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | |||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | |||
Former [1983/34] | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
International Standard Electric Corporation 320 Park Avenue New York New York 10022 / US | ||
For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | |||
For:DE
FR
IT
NL
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | |||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beerwald, Hans, Dr. Kalkgasse 2 D-5370 Kall-Sistig / DE | 02 /
Böhm, Günter, Dr. Haarholzer Strasse 21 D-4630 Bochum / DE | 03 /
Glomski, Günter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 5 D-4630 Bochum / DE | 04 /
Wittmann, Manfred, Dr. Karlstrasse 10 D-7145 Hardthof / DE | [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | 01 /
Beerwald, Hans, Dr. Kalkgasse 2 D-5370 Kall-Sistig / DE | ||
02 /
Böhm, Günter, Dr. Haarholzer Strasse 21 D-4630 Bochum / DE | |||
03 /
Glomski, Günter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 5 D-4630 Bochum / DE | |||
04 /
Wittmann, Manfred, Dr. Karlstrasse 10 D-7145 Hardthof / DE | Representative(s) | Graf, Georg Hugo, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | Graf, Georg Hugo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1983/34] | Graf, Georg Hugo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100804.0 | 28.01.1983 | [1983/34] | Priority number, date | DE19823204846 | 11.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3204846 | [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | DE19823204846 | 11.02.1982 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0086378 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086378 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/025, C03C17/02 | [1983/34] | CPC: |
C03B37/0183 (EP,US);
C03B37/01846 (EP,US);
C03C17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Plasmaverfahren zur Innenbeschichtung von Glasrohren | [1983/34] | English: | Method of plasma-coating the inside surface of a glass tube | [1983/34] | French: | Procédé à plasma pour le revêtement intérieur de tubes en verre | [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | Plasmaverfahren zur Innenbeschichtung von Glasrohren | ||
Former [1983/34] | Method of plasma-coating the inside surface of a glass tube | ||
Former [1983/34] | Procédé à plasma pour le revêtement intérieur de tubes en verre | Examination procedure | 15.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 11.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4280829 (SHETH KALAPI D); | [Y]FR2427310 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]FR2450239 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | - J.IRVEN; A.ROBINSON, "Optical fibres produced by plasma augmented vapour deposition", PHYSICS & CHEM. OF GLASSES, (1980), vol. 21 |