EP0087600 - Heat exchanger for heat pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grötz, Franz GmbH & Co.KG Bauunternehmung Jahnstrasse 19 D-7560 Gaggenau / DE | [1983/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klusch, Siegfried Talhauser-Strasse 23 D-7801 Ebringen / DE | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Ratzel, Gerhard Seckenheimer Strasse 36a 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Ratzel, Gerhard, Dr. Seckenheimer Strasse 36a D-68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100900.6 | 01.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19823206701 | 25.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3206701 | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087600 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087600 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087600 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/24 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
F24S10/502 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/36] | F24J3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher für Wärmepumpen | [1983/36] | English: | Heat exchanger for heat pumps | [1983/36] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur pour pompe à chaleur | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.06.1986 | SE | 30.06.1986 | LU | 28.02.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | IT | 04.06.1986 | |
SE | 30.06.1986 | ||
GB | 01.02.1987 | ||
LU | 28.02.1987 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.06.1986 | |
SE | 30.06.1986 | ||
GB | 01.02.1987 | ||
Former [1989/30] | SE | 30.06.1986 | |
GB | 01.02.1987 | ||
Former [1989/15] | SE | 30.06.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3194228 (AMAT BARGUES MIGUEL); | [A]US3369539 (THOMASON HARRY E); | [A]DE2245153 (BETEILIGUNGS AG HAUSTECHNIK); | [A]FR2380511 (TRIMBOLI LONGETTO ANTONIO [ES]); | [A]FR2390557 (TOOS ETS [LI]); | [A]FR2395469 (PARICA CIE PARIS INGENIEURS CO [FR]); | [A]US4158357 (ALLEGRO JOSEPH); | [A]US4164933 (ALOSI ANTHONY C); | [A]DE2814004 (WOERMANN BAUCHEMIE HOLDING AG); | [A]GB1555485 (DOBSON M J W D); | [A]DE2826937 (HELIOTHERM AG); | [A]GB2026679 (SOLAR HOLDING SA); | [A]US4222373 (DAVIS MICHAEL A); | [A]FR2454074 (COMTE PAUL); | [A]DE2940838 (BORSDORF HEINZ DIPL ING); | [X]DE3000289 (SPIELVOGEL PETER); | [A]US4300539 (DOBSON MICHAEL J) |