EP0090145 - Process and device for storing optical information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1988 [1988/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjorklund, Gary Carl 1201 Eureka Avenue Los Altos California 94022 / US | 02 /
Burland, Donald Maxwell 116 Verona Court Los Gatos California 95030 / US | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83100912.1 | 01.02.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | US19820364160 | 31.03.1982 Original published format: US 364160 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090145 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090145 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090145 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G03C1/72 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
G11B7/0065 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
G03H1/181 (EP,US);
G03H2001/026 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0264 (EP,US);
G03H2222/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Speichern optischer Information | [1983/40] | English: | Process and device for storing optical information | [1983/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'enregistrement d'information optique | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/14] | 25.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4084970 (BLOOM ALLEN, et al); | [A]EP0044457 (IBM [US]) | [A] - LASER FOCUS, vol. 17, no. 3, March 1981, Newton "Self-developing holographic material does not degrade when read by laser", pages 22, 24 | Examination | - Dr. W. Söll, J. H. Kirchner, Digitale Speicher, 1978, Würzburg, p. 54-57 |