EP0085935 - Travelling plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Napierski, Reinhard Talstrasse 16 D-61194 Niddatal / DE | [1983/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/33] | Representative(s) | Jochem, Bernd Heinrich - Erb - Partner Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Hanauer Landstrasse 126-128 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Jochem, Bernd Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem Postfach 18 02 04 60083 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1983/33] | Jochem, Bernd, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem, Postfach 17 01 45 D-60075 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100966.7 | 02.02.1983 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | DE19823203809 | 04.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3203809 | [1983/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0085935 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0085935 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085935 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R27/00 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
H01R27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/33] | Title | German: | Reisestecker | [1983/33] | English: | Travelling plug | [1983/33] | French: | Fiche pour voyageur | [1983/33] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 01.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB622565 (ARUNDELL WALLIS FAULKNER); | [A]FR1242986 ; | [A]US2989719 (AARLAHT CARL J); | [A]DE7807806U ; | [A]EP0033723 (PALLADINI MARIO) |