EP0087065 - Process for the reduction of the heavy metal content in raw phosphate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.1986 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.1986 [1986/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolstein, Friedrich, Dr. Goethe-Strasse 66 D-4300 Essen / DE | 02 /
Baechle, Hans-Tuisko, Dr. Am Rech 1 D-6246 Glashütten/Taunus / DE | 03 /
von Plessen, Helmold, Dr. Kugelherrnstrasse 16 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Orth, Adolf Ferdinand, Dr. Habichtsweg 7 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Tergau, Ulrich, et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Tergau, Ulrich, Dr., et al HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101225.7 | 09.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | DE19823204963 | 12.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3204963 | DE19823210575 | 23.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3210575 | [1983/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087065 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087065 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/238 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
C01B25/01 (EP);
C22B3/385 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung des Schwermetallgehaltes im Rohphosphat | [1983/35] | English: | Process for the reduction of the heavy metal content in raw phosphate | [1983/35] | French: | Procédé pour la réduction de métal lourd contenu dans le phosphate brut | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 07.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2447390 ; | JPS5375196 [ ] (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [A]EP0023195 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19781127), vol. 89, no. 22, Database accession no. 181887A, page 109, column 2 | [AP] - SAUERBECK D. ET AL, "Cadmium contamination of mineral fertilizers depending on raw material and production processes", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19820329), vol. 96, no. 12, Database accession no. 103081P, page 609, column 2 | [ ] - LANDWIRTSCH. FORSCH., SONDERH., (1980), vol. 37, pages 685 - 696 |