EP0087644 - Turning multiple-winding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenze GmbH & Co. KG Aerzen Hans-Lenze-Strasse 1 D-3251 Aerzen 1 / DE | [1985/47] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Stahlkontor Weser Lenze GmbH & Co. KG Hans-Lenze-Strasse 1 D-3251 Aerzen 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehrmann, Claus Haydenstrasse 8 D-4923 Extertal / DE | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101297.6 | 10.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19823205779 | 18.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3205779 | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087644 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087644 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/14 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
B65H18/16 (EP,US);
B65H18/0212 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/36] | B65H17/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/36] | Title | German: | Mehrfach-Wickelwendemaschine | [1983/36] | English: | Turning multiple-winding machine | [1983/36] | French: | Bobineuse multiple tournante | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/49] | 26.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.09.1985 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2423227 (ARTOS MEIER WINDHORST KG); | [A]DE2632608 (NISHIMURA SEISAKUSHO CO); | [AD]DE7728223U ; | [AD]DE8124903U |