EP0090934 - Pipe sealing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOCO Franz-Josef Wolf & Co. Sprudelallee 19 63628 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | For all designated states WOCO Franz-Josef Wolf & Co. Sprudelallee 19 D-63628 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Franz Josef Sprudelallee 19 D-6483 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | 02 /
Lauer, Hansjörg Marburger Strasse 5 D-6483 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | [1983/41] | Representative(s) | Jaeger, Klaus, et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster Patentanwälte Postfach 1620 D-82121 Gauting / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster Patentanwälte Postfach 1620 D-82121 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101577.1 | 18.02.1983 | [1983/41] | Priority number, date | DE19823212441 | 02.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3212441 | [1983/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090934 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090934 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/02 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
F16L17/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/41] | Title | German: | Rohrdichtung | [1983/41] | English: | Pipe sealing | [1983/41] | French: | Garniture de tuyau | [1983/41] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/13] | 07.12.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4188040 ; | [X]DE2743238 ; | [A]DE2812196 ; | [A]AT341286B |