EP0087726 - Biochemical factor, its preparation and agent containing said factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.1987 [1987/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mach, Walter, Dr., Dipl.-Phys. Wasserburger Strasse 17 D-8011 Kirchseeon / DE | [1986/17] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Lohmann Tierernährung GmbH Neufelder Strasse 24-28 D-2190 Cuxhaven / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/17] |
Former [1983/36] | 01 /
Mach, Walter J., Dr. Wasserburgerstrasse 17 D-8011 Kirchseeon/München / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101675.3 | 22.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19823206911 | 26.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3206911 | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087726 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087726 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07G1/00, A23K1/16, // A61K35/78 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A23K20/10 (EP,US);
A23K20/111 (EP,US);
A23K20/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Biochemischer Wirkstoff, dessen Herstellung und diesen Wirkstoff enthaltendes Mittel | [1983/36] | English: | Biochemical factor, its preparation and agent containing said factor | [1983/36] | French: | Facteur biochimique, sa préparation et agent contenant ce facteur | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 28.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 29.08.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/12] | 29.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]HU622 ; | [X]DE2001947 (TEISEKI TELNITE INDUSTRY CO LT); | [Y]DE2850281 (MEDITEST INST FUER MEDIZINISCH); | [A]DE2031662 ; | [AP]DE3126352 (PETI NITROGENMUEVEK [HU]) | [Y] - AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Band 40, Nr. 1, 1976, Seiten 33-40, Tokyo, JP; T. GOMYO et al.: "On the interaction of melanoidin with metallic ions" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 74, Nr. 11, 15. März 1971, Seite 237, Nr. 52305a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & HU-A-622 (CSUCSKA, E. et al.) 24.07.1970, & HU622 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 82, Nr. 23, 9. Juni 1975, Seite 427, Nr. 154029w, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. KAJIMOTO et al.: "Metal-protein complex. V. Reactionsbetwseen the browning reaction products from glycine and reducing sugars and metals" & YUKAGAKU 1975, 24(1), 15-21 | [AD] - DIE ERNÄHRUNGSUMSCHAU, Band 7, 1971, Seiten 295-296; W. MACH: "Nativer Leberschutzstoff für diätische und the rapeutische Anwendung" |