EP0117268 - Ring laser gyro [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell Regelsysteme GmbH Kaiserleistrasse 55 D-63067 Offenbach / DE | [1986/44] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states HONEYWELL GMBH Kaiserleistrasse 55 D-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Rainer, Dipl.-Phys. Kilianstädter Strasse 13 D-6454 Bruchköbel / DE | 02 /
Hansli, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Moosbergstrasse 30 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Weih, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Lindenstrasse 32 D-6451 Grosskrotzenburg / DE | 04 /
Bolzmann, Bernd, Dr. rer. nat. Konrad Adenauer Strasse 18 D-6454 Bruchköbel / DE | 05 /
Holick, Franz-Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Hermesstrasse 1 D-6078 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [1984/36] | Representative(s) | Herzbach, Dieter, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101921.1 | 26.02.1983 | [1984/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117268 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117268 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/05, H01S3/083 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
G01C19/661 (EP);
H01S3/083 (EP);
H01S3/0835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/36] | Title | German: | Ringlaserkreisel | [1984/36] | English: | Ring laser gyro | [1984/36] | French: | Gyroscope laser annulaire | [1984/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/29] | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2175662 ; | [A]FR2058417 |