Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] |
24.11.1986 | Correction of patent specification | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] |
31.05.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] |
29.05.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |
31.03.1984 | Publication of search report | published on 30.05.1984 [1984/22] |
16.07.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.1983 [1983/37] |