EP0088327 - Process for the preparation of methacrylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/37] | Process and catalyst for the preparation of methacrylic acid | ||
[1986/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krabetz, Richard, Dr. Unterer Waldweg 8 D-6719 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Duembgen, Gerd, Dr. Sudetenstrasse 4 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 03 /
Nees, Friedbert, Dr. Fichtestrasse 4 D-7513 Stutensee / DE | 04 /
Merger, Franz, Dr. Max-Slevogt-Strasse 25 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Fouquet, Gerd, Dr. Maxburgstrasse 2 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | [1983/37] | Application number, filing date | 83101938.5 | 28.02.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | DE19823208572 | 10.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3208572 | [1983/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088327 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088327 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088327 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0088327 | Date: | 09.09.1986 | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/18, C07C57/055 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
B01J27/19 (EP,US);
C07C51/235 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/235, C07C57/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Methacrylsäure | [1986/29] | English: | Process for the preparation of methacrylic acid | [1986/29] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de l'acide méthacrylique | [1986/29] |
Former [1983/37] | Verfahren und Katalysator zur Herstellung von Methacrylsäure | ||
Former [1983/37] | Process and catalyst for the preparation of methacrylic acid | ||
Former [1983/37] | Procédé et catalyseur pour la préparation de l'acide méthacrylique | Examination procedure | 22.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2429095 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | [XD]DE2523757 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]GB1438806 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [AD]US3965163 (ODA YOSHIO, et al); | [AD]DE2832132 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD); | [AD]DE2952455 (HALCON RES & DEV); | [AD]DE3010434 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK); | [A]US4272408 (DANIEL CHELLIAH) | Examination | EP0088328 |