EP0087800 - Device for splitting round wood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Linck, Maschinenfabrik "Gatterlinck" GmbH & Co.KG Appenweierer Strasse 46 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE | [1986/46] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Gebrüder Linck Maschinenfabrik "Gatterlinck" GmbH & Co. KG Appenweierer Strasse 46 Postfach 1341 D-77697 Oberkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101972.4 | 01.03.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19823207547 | 03.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3207547 | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087800 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087800 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087800 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B27B25/04 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
B27B31/08 (EP,US);
B27B25/04 (EP,US);
B27B5/228 (EP,US);
B27G19/08 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2087 (EP,US);
Y10T83/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, LI, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zerteilen von Rundholz | [1983/36] | English: | Device for splitting round wood | [1983/36] | French: | Dispositif de tronçonnage de billes | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 09.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1225840 [ ] (DIEMER AUTOMATENBAU BODO DIEME); | US3401785 [ ] (FERRARI ARTHUR M); | DE1920574 [ ] (KARL HAIST FA); | US3654971 [ ] (PRYOR FRANK H); | DE7439738U [ ]; | FR2469990 [ ] (WURSTER & DIETZ MASCHF [DE]) |