EP0088347 - Apparatus for keeping the tension of metal strips at a constant level [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.07.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umlauf, Norbert Haferkamp 64 58093 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states Umlauf, Norbert Haferkamp 64 D-58093 Hagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Bergen, Klaus, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 11 01 23 40501 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Bergen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König, Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen, Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 D-40219 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102006.0 | 02.03.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | DE19823208158 | 06.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3208158 | [1983/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088347 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088347 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0088347 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/10 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
B21C47/006 (EP,US);
B21C47/003 (EP,US);
B21C47/3458 (EP,US);
B65H20/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/37] | Title | German: | Kettenzieh- und Kettenbremsvorrichtung zum Konstanthalten der Spannungen von Metallbändern | [1983/37] | English: | Apparatus for keeping the tension of metal strips at a constant level | [1983/37] | French: | Dispositif à chaînes de tirage et de freinage pour la stabilisation des tensions de bandes métalliques | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 27.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.02.1987
20.03.1987
ADMISSIBLE VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Muldenstrasse 5 A-4020 Linz / AT Opponent's representative Hübscher, Helmut, et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.02.1987
20.03.1987
ADMISSIBLE VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Muldenstrasse 5 A-4020 Linz / AT Opponent's representative Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | 10.06.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.10.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.06.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.05.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.06.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.10.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2418695 [ ] (ALFSEN & GUNDERSON); | GB2072152 [ ] (JAPAN DEV CONSULT) |