EP0119278 - Actuator button shaped in one piece for a pressurised aerosol dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Precision Valve Corporation P.O. Box 309 700 Nepperhan Avenue Yonkers New York 10702 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states Precision Valve Corporation P.O. Box 309 700 Nepperhan Avenue Yonkers New York 10702 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayes, Thomas D. 28 Ellery Lane Westport Connecticut 06880 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing., et al Kühhornshofweg 10 D-60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102074.8 | 03.03.1983 | [1984/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119278 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
B65D83/206 (EP,US);
B65D83/228 (EP,US);
B65D83/24 (EP,US);
B65D2215/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/39] | Title | German: | Einstückig geformter Betätigungskopf für eine unter Innendruck stehende Aerosol-Ausgabevorrichtung | [1984/39] | English: | Actuator button shaped in one piece for a pressurised aerosol dispenser | [1984/39] | French: | Bouton de commande monobloc pour dispositif de décharge d'aérosol mis sous pression interne | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 28.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/50] | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.03.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4013231 (VAN VELDHOVEN GEORGE E); | [A]US3610479 (VENUS FRANK JR); | [A]US4325497 (EWALD RONALD F); | [A]FR2271995 (AEROSOL INVENTIONS DEV [CH]) |