EP0090261 - Drying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurimoto, Ltd. 12-19, Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states Kurimoto, Ltd. 12-19, Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toei, Ryozo 11-1, Yanada-cho Shimogamo, Sakayo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kanichi 38-9, Yuyumadai 2-chome Kawanishi-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Mizuta, Koji 11, 4-chome Bodai-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Ohashi, Koji 2649-445, Oyamada-cho Kawachi Nagano-shi Osaka / JP | 05 /
Hizuka, Kazuhiko 1-510, 3-chome, Ichigaya-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo / JP | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102595.2 | 16.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | JP19820053053 | 30.03.1982 Original published format: JP 5305382 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090261 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090261 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/20, F26B3/24, F26B7/00 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
F26B3/00 (EP);
B01F35/95 (EP);
B29B13/065 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP);
F26B17/20 (EP);
F26B3/084 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/40] | Title | German: | Trocknungsanlage | [1983/40] | English: | Drying apparatus | [1983/40] | French: | Appareil de séchage | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 28.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 14.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/11] | 07.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE170713 ; | [A]US954033 (KISER LEWIS C [US]); | [A]AT51537B (PHOENIX WERK G M B H); | [A]FR1583837 ; | [A]DE1629097 (TICONA POLYMERWERKE GMBH); | [A]CH500452 (BUSS AG [CH]); | [A]US3613777 (NARA JIYUICHI); | [A]US3678596 (KUBO KAZUNORI); | [A]AT335362B (LUWA AG [CH]); | [A]DE3024710 (HAUPT HELMUT) |