EP0090983 - Hydrodynamic power transmission apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHD Canada Inc. DEUTZ R & D Devision 4660 Hickmore St. Montreal/Quebec / CA | [1983/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slezak, Paul John 12486 Toulouse Street Pierrefonds Quebec / CA | [1983/41] | Representative(s) | Nau, Walter Patentanwalt Johann-Pullem-Strasse 8 50999 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | Nau, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Johann-Pullem-Strasse 8 D-50999 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102686.9 | 18.03.1983 | [1983/41] | Priority number, date | DE19823212505 | 03.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3212505 | [1983/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090983 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090983 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/04, F16H41/30, F16D33/18 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
F16D33/18 (EP,US);
F01P7/042 (EP,US);
F16H41/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/41] | Title | German: | Hydrodynamische Kraftübertragungsvorrichtung | [1983/41] | English: | Hydrodynamic power transmission apparatus | [1983/41] | French: | Dispositif hydrodynamique de transmission de puissance | [1983/41] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/42] | 15.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1286840 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]DE1079894 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]GB857746 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]EP0012015 (JACOBS MFG CO [US]); | [AD]DE921181 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) |