EP0095026 - Injector pump unit with a sleeve-valve controlled floating piston for internal-combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poore, Bernard Brandt 722 51st Ave. E.Moline Illinois 61244 / US | 02 /
May, Charles William 1900 Hawthorne Dr. Cedar Falls Iowa 50613 / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1983/48] | Application number, filing date | 83102732.1 | 19.03.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820361681 | 25.03.1982 Original published format: US 361681 | US19820361680 | 25.03.1982 Original published format: US 361680 | [1983/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0095026 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095026 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/32 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
F02M59/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/48] | Title | German: | Pumpen-Düsen-Einheit mit durch Hülsenventil gesteuertem Freikolben für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1983/48] | English: | Injector pump unit with a sleeve-valve controlled floating piston for internal-combustion engines | [1983/48] | French: | Pompe à injection combinée ayant un piston libre commandé par un tiroir tubulaire pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1983/48] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 01.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1266566 (HONDA GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK); | [AD]EP0014142 (BENDIX CORP [US]) |