EP0093868 - Electron beam apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Tai-Hon Philip 36 Pond Hill Road Cappaqua New York 10514 / US | 02 /
Coane, Philip James 14 Carmine Drive Mahopac New York 10541 / US | 03 /
Hohn, Fritz-Jurgen 47 Whippoorwill Road E. Armonk, New York 10504 / US | 04 /
Kern, Dieter Paul 2615 Colonial Street Yorktown Heights New York 10598 / US | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1983/46] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83102957.4 | 25.03.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | US19820376350 | 10.05.1982 Original published format: US 376350 | [1983/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093868 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093868 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093868 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/04, H01J37/30 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
H01J37/04 (EP,US);
H01J37/3007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/46] | Title | German: | Elektronenstrahlröhre | [1983/46] | English: | Electron beam apparatus | [1983/46] | French: | Appareil à rayons électroniques | [1983/46] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/22] | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2338452 (WINKLER VIKTOR DR-ING); | [A]GB2081003 (SMITH KENNETH C A) | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 11A, April 1982, pages 5388-5390, New York, US; T.P. CHANG et al.: "Tri-potential method for testing electrical opens and shorts in multi-layer ceramic packaging modules" |