EP0091634 - Coffee machine for domestic use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOULINEX S.A. 76 - 78 Ave des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states MOULINEX S.A. 76 - 78 Ave des Champs Elysées F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states MOULINEX S.A. 11, rue Jules-Ferry F-93170 Bagnolet / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amiot, Jacques Henri Julien Société MOULINEX 25 route de Mamers F-61000 Alencon / FR | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | May, Hans Ulrich Patentanwalt Dr.H.U.May, Thierschstrasse 27 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | May, Hans Ulrich, Dr. Patentanwalt Dr.H.U.May, Thierschstrasse 27 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103279.2 | 05.04.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | FR19820006256 | 09.04.1982 Original published format: FR 8206256 | [1983/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0091634 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091634 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/057, A47J31/06 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
A47J31/061 (EP,US);
A47J31/0621 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/42] | Title | German: | Haushaltskaffeemaschine | [1983/42] | English: | Coffee machine for domestic use | [1983/42] | French: | Cafetière ménagère | [1983/42] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 30.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2625650 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]CH616064 (WIDMANN GOTTLOB WIGO & SOEHNE [DE]); | [A]EP0019291 (MOULINEX SA [FR]); | [A]DE8027643U |