EP0091125 - Permanent magnet electrical motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martire, Roger La Croix Dominique F-46700 Puy l'Evêque / FR | [1983/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/41] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103349.3 | 06.04.1983 | [1983/41] | Priority number, date | FR19820006026 | 07.04.1982 Original published format: FR 8206026 | [1983/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0091125 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091125 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H02K23/54, H02K23/04 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
H02K23/62 (EP);
H02K25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/41] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Dauermagnetmotor | [1983/41] | English: | Permanent magnet electrical motor | [1983/41] | French: | Moteur électrique à aimants permanents | [1983/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US4358693 ; | [Y]DD34431 ; | [Y]US3832581 ; | [Y]FR1477322 ; | [A]DE1074137 ; | [A]DE1826690U ; | [A]US3128404 |