EP0092705 - X-ray diagnostic apparatus with an image intensifier television system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1987 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Dieter Im Letten 18 D-8524 Hetzles / DE | [1983/44] | Application number, filing date | 83103365.9 | 06.04.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | DE19823215114 | 23.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3215114 | [1983/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092705 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092705 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H05G1/54, H05G1/64 | [1983/44] | CPC: |
H05G1/64 (EP,US);
H05G1/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1983/44] | Title | German: | Röntgendiagnostikanlage mit einer Bildverstärker-Fernsehkette | [1983/44] | English: | X-ray diagnostic apparatus with an image intensifier television system | [1983/44] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic par rayons X comportant une chaîne de télévision à intensificateur d'images | [1983/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3567854 (TSCHANTZ LESLIE G, et al); | [A]FR2305094 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]FR2415938 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4185198 (FUJIMOTO YUICHI [JP]) |