EP0091668 - Drum for a washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIE ZANUSSI S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo 3 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1983/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Regazzo, Olindo Via Stuparich 6 I-31100 Treviso / IT | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103413.7 | 07.04.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | IT19820034014U | 13.04.1982 Original published format: IT 3401482 U | [1983/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091668 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091668 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/10 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
D06F37/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/42] | Title | German: | Waschmaschinentrommel | [1983/42] | English: | Drum for a washing machine | [1983/42] | French: | Tambour pour une machine à laver | [1983/42] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/47] | 06.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1610103 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]FR1535335 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]FR1033252 ; | [A]FR2085816 (BOSCH); | [A]DE390616 (HURLEY MACHINE CO); | [A]GB218482 (ENTWISTLE AND KENYON LTD, et al) |