EP0092118 - Band-box for a darkening device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/43] | Darkening device | ||
[1986/40] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.10.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rademacher Geräte-Elektronik GmbH Buschkamp 7 D-4292 Rhede / DE | [1989/36] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states Rademacher, Willi Buschkamp 7 D-46414 Rhede / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1989/36] |
Former [1983/43] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, et al Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener, Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103416.0 | 08.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | DE19823214235 | 17.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3214235 | [1983/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092118 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092118 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/20, E06B9/204 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
E06B9/78 (EP);
E06B9/70 (EP);
E06B2009/785 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Gurtkasten für eine Verdunkelungsvorrichtung | [1986/40] | English: | Band-box for a darkening device | [1986/40] | French: | Caisson pour sangle de dispositif d'assombrissement | [1986/40] |
Former [1983/43] | Verdunkelungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [1983/43] | Darkening device | ||
Former [1983/43] | Dispositif d'assombrissement | Examination procedure | 04.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 30.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
30.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Steinel GmbH & Co. KG Dieselstrasse 80-86 D-33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
30.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Steinel GmbH & Co. KG Dieselstrasse 80-86 D-33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1987
30.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Steinel GmbH & Co. KG Dieselstrasse 80-86 D-33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | 06.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.11.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.03.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.06.1989 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.06.1989 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1830405 (TADASHI OHNO); | [X]DE6600180U (ROLLADEN HERMS K G FA [DE]); | [A]CH521509 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE7901479U ; | [A]DE8033637U | Examination | - "Selve-Elektroantriebe",1968, Ernst Selve, 5981 Augustenthal | by applicant | DE6600180U | DE8033637U |