EP0094506 - DNA cloning vector TG1, derivatives, products and processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1989 [1989/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foor, Forrest 419 West 56th Street New York New York 10019 / US | 02 /
Morin, Nancy R. 602 Linden Place Cranford New Jersey 07016 / US | 03 /
Roberts, Gary P. 170 Belvidere Avenue Fanwood New Jersey 07023 / US | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103520.9 | 12.04.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | US19820368551 | 15.04.1982 Original published format: US 368551 | US19820368544 | 15.04.1982 Original published format: US 368544 | [1983/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094506 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094506 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094506 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N7/00, C12N1/20, // C12R1/91, C12R1/465, C12P17/18, C12P21/02 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N1/00 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP);
C12N15/76 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12N9/12 (EP);
C12P17/184 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/47] | Title | German: | DNS Klonierungsvektor TG1, Derivate, Produkte und Verfahren | [1983/47] | English: | DNA cloning vector TG1, derivatives, products and processes | [1983/47] | French: | Vecteur de clonage TG1 à base d'ADN, dérivés, produits et procédés | [1983/47] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 05.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 30.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CURR. TOP. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., vol. 96, 1982, pages 69-95; K.F. CHATER et al.: "Gene cloning in streptomyces" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 7, 13th August 1979, page 336, no. 52550c, Columbus, Ohio, US; F. FLETT et al.: "A common host specificity in the restriction and modification of a bacteriophage by three distinct Streptomyces species" & J. GEN. MICROBIOL. 1979, 110(2), 465-7 |