EP0092151 - Device for optically indicating the working condition of a power supply network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Pfisterer Elektrotechnische Spezialartikel GmbH & Co. KG Augsburger Strasse 375 D-7000 Stuttgart 60 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states Karl Pfisterer Elektrotechnische Spezialartikel GmbH & Co. KG Augsburger Strasse 375 D-7000 Stuttgart 60 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, Martin Heidestrasse 51 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Bachmeier, Albert Römersteinweg 17 D-7067 Plüderhausen / DE | 03 /
Schächterle, Werner Forststrasse 26 D-7057 Winnenden / DE | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103544.9 | 13.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | DE19823214484 | 20.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3214484 | [1983/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092151 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092151 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/145 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
G01R19/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur optischen Anzeige des Betriebszustandes eines Energieversorgungsnetzes | [1983/43] | English: | Device for optically indicating the working condition of a power supply network | [1983/43] | French: | Dispositif pour indiquer visuellement la condition d'exploitation d'un réseau fournisseur d'énergie | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 27.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1928951 (PENDOCK JONATHAN C); | [A]FR1395898 (SCHUTZAPPARATE PARIS & CO); | [AD]EP0012285 (PFISTERER ELEKTROTECH KARL [DE]) | Examination | DE2854415 | DE2909060 |