EP0092202 - Digital-to-analog converting apparatus equipped with calibrating function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Public Corporation 1-6 Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahi-cho 1-chome Nerima-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibayama, Akinori 7, Toyotamanaka 4-chome Nermia-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Niijima, Hironobu 1049-3, Aoyagi Tatebayashi-shi Gunma / JP | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103675.1 | 15.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | JP19820064166 | 16.04.1982 Original published format: JP 6416682 | [1983/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0092202 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0092202 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092202 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
G05B19/231 (EP,US);
H03M1/1071 (EP,US);
H03M1/745 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/43] | H03K13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1983/43] | Title | German: | Digital-Analog Umwandlungsgerät ausgerüstet mit Eichungsfunktion | [1983/43] | English: | Digital-to-analog converting apparatus equipped with calibrating function | [1983/43] | French: | Appareil de conversion numérique-analogique muni d'une fonction d'étalonnage | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 20.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2069265 (HYBRID SYSTEMS CORP); | [A]FR2447119 (BURR BROWN RES CORP [US]); | [A]GB2022347 (BENDIX CORP); | [A]EP0043897 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-16, no. 6, December 1981, pages 616-621, IEEE, New York, US; K. MAIO et al.: "An untrimmed D/A converter with 14-bit resolution" |