EP0096198 - An articulated pipe section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IWK Regler und Kompensatoren GmbH Postfach 11 62, Lorenzstrasse 6 D-76288 Stutensee-Blankenloch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states IWK Regler und Kompensatoren GmbH Postfach 11 62, Lorenzstrasse 6 D-76288 Stutensee-Blankenloch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nonnenmacher, Wilfried Schwarzwaldstrasse 1 D-7537 Remchingen-Wi. / DE | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103766.8 | 19.04.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | DE19823220811 | 03.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3220811 | [1983/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0096198 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0096198 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096198 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16L51/02 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
F24D10/00 (EP);
F16L51/03 (EP);
Y02B30/17 (EP);
Y02E20/14 (EP);
Y02P80/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/51] | Title | German: | Rohrgelenkstück | [1983/51] | English: | An articulated pipe section | [1983/51] | French: | Tronçon articulé pour conduite | [1983/51] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 07.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1303514 (KARLSRUHE AUGSBURG IWEKA); | [A]FR2106751 (JONCHERE MANUF METAL); | [A]FR2247664 (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH [DE]); | [Y]GB2034843 (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) |