EP0094528 - Process for producing double-layer structures consisting of metal silicide and polysilicium on substrates containing integrated circuits by reactive ion etching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beinvogl, Willy, Dr. Tutzinger Strasse 3 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1983/47] | Application number, filing date | 83104121.5 | 27.04.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | DE19823216823 | 05.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3216823 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094528 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094528 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L21/90 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/32137 (EP,US);
H01L21/76889 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Strukturen von aus Metallsilizid und Polysilizium bestehenden Doppelschichten auf integrierte Halbleiterschaltungen enthaltenden Substraten durch reaktives Ionenätzen | [1983/47] | English: | Process for producing double-layer structures consisting of metal silicide and polysilicium on substrates containing integrated circuits by reactive ion etching | [1983/47] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de structures à double couche comportant du silicide de métal et du polysilicium sur des substrats comportant des circuits intégrés par attaque chimique par ions réactifs | [1983/47] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 29.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/06] | Request for further processing for: | 17.04.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5731140 ; | [XP]GB2098931 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 99 (E-111)[977], 8. Juni 1982; & JP-A-57 31 140 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 19-02-1982, & JP5731140 A 00000000 | [A] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, Band 81-1, Mai 1981, Seiten 586-588, Pennington, New Jersey, US; W. BEINVOGL et al.: "Anisotropic etching of polysilicon and metal silicides in fluorine containing plasma" | [A] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, Band 81-2, Oktober 1981, Seiten 652-654, Pennington, New Jersey, US; W.W. YAO et al.: "Anisotropic polysilicon etching with Cl2 plasma" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 128, Nr. 2, Februar 1981, Seiten 366-370, Manchester, New Hampshire, US; A.C. ADAMS et al.: "Edge profiles in the plasma etching of polycrystalline silicon" | [A] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, Band 25, Nr. 4, April 1982, Seiten 121-125, Port Washington, New York, US; E.C. WHITCOMB et al.: "Reactive ion etching of submicron MoSi2/poly-Si gates for CMOS/SOS devices" | [XP] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B, Band 1, Nr. 1, Januar-März 1983, Seiten 15-22, American Vacuum Society, New York, US; H.J. MATTAUSCH et al.: "Reactive ion etching of Ta-silicide/polysilicon double layers for the fabrication of integrated circuits" |