EP0096218 - Differentially magnetically sensitive diode structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinal, Albert Watson 810 Queensferry Rd. Cary, NC 27511 / US | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Siccardi, Louis Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Siccardi, Louis Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1983/51] | Combeau, Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 83104290.8 | 02.05.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | US19820388773 | 15.06.1982 Original published format: US 388773 | [1983/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0096218 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0096218 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096218 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/82 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
H01L29/82 (EP);
G01R33/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/51] | Title | German: | Magnetfeldempfindliche Differential-Diodenstruktur | [1983/51] | English: | Differentially magnetically sensitive diode structure | [1983/51] | French: | Structure différentielle de diode sensible au champ magnétique | [1983/51] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PD]EP0063209 ; | [A]EP0006983 | [A] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 55, no. 10, 19th May 1982, pages 45,46, New York, US; R. BERESFORD: "Magnetic transistors exploit new theory of carrier modulation" |