EP0093450 - Differential pressure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | For:DE
Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | ||
For:DE
Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | |||
Former [1983/45] | For:GB
NL
ITT INDUSTRIES INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | ||
For:DE
Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romo, Edgar Arturo 1071 Vallejo Circle Costa Mesa, California / US | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Graf, Georg Hugo, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | Graf, Georg Hugo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104327.8 | 02.05.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | US19820374972 | 05.05.1982 Original published format: US 374972 | [1983/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093450 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093450 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01L13/06, G01L19/04, G01L1/22 | [1984/15] | CPC: |
G01L1/2281 (EP,US);
G01L9/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/45] | G01L13/06, G01L19/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1983/45] | Title | German: | Differentialdruckmessvorrichtung | [1983/45] | English: | Differential pressure apparatus | [1983/45] | French: | Appareil de pression différentiel | [1983/45] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/30] | 12.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57008425 ; | [Y]DE2917237 (BURR BROWN RES CORP); | [YP]EP0071962 (FOXBORO CO [US]); | [YP]EP0053486 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [AD]DE2841491 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 66, 27 April 1982; & JP-A-57 008 425, & JP57008425 A 19820427 |