EP0094008 - A process of encapsulating aqueous liquid wastes in liquid thermosettable resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1986 [1986/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carini, Pietro T. Drusbergstrasse 22 CH-8810 Horgen / CH | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104354.2 | 03.05.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | US19820376466 | 10.05.1982 Original published format: US 376466 | [1983/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094008 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094008 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094008 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/16 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
G21F9/167 (EP,US);
F04D29/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einbetten von wässrigen flüssigen Abfallstoffen in flüssigen wärmehärtbaren Kunstharzen | [1985/46] | English: | A process of encapsulating aqueous liquid wastes in liquid thermosettable resins | [1983/46] | French: | Procédé d'encapsulage de déchets liquides aqueux dans des résines liquides thermodurcissables | [1983/46] |
Former [1983/46] | Verfahren zum Einbetten von wässrigen flüssigen Abfallstoffen in flüssige thermoverhärtbare Kunstharze | Examination procedure | 17.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/30] | 22.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7874748 ; | [AP]JP5756039 ; | [AD]US4077901 (ARNOLD JOHN L, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 20, 13th November 1978, abstract no. 168583d, Columbus, Ohio, US & JP - A - 78 74 748 (HASHISAKI HIKOSABURO) 03-07-1978, & JP7874748 A 00000000 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 14, 4th April 1983, page 515, no. 115613t, Columbus, Ohio, US & JP - A - 57 56 039 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP.) 27-11-1982, & JP5756039 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 10, 9th March 1981, page 61, no. 66935f, Columbus, Ohio, US | Examination | EP0044960 |