EP0097236 - Blowing device for removing banks in silos for bulk material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1987 [1987/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSR Engineering GmbH Fördertechnik Hingbergstrasse 319 D-45472 Mülheim / DE | [1984/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rappen, Albert, Dipl.-Ing. Karlsruher Strasse 87 D-4330 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | [1984/01] | Representative(s) | Honke, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | Honke, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104416.9 | 05.05.1983 | [1984/01] | Priority number, date | DE19823223406 | 23.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3223406 | [1984/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097236 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097236 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/72 | [1984/01] | CPC: |
B65D88/703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/01] | Title | German: | Blasvorrichtung zum Beseitigen von Aufstauungen in Lagersilos für Schüttgut | [1984/01] | English: | Blowing device for removing banks in silos for bulk material | [1984/01] | French: | Dispositif de soufflage pour l'élimination des accumulations dans les silos pour matériaux en vrac | [1984/01] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/15] | 28.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0021999 [ ]; | DE2402001 [ ]; | DE726658 [ ] |