blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0098929

EP0098929 - Process for preparing polyphenylene oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.1986
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.1990Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.06.1990 [1990/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
45764 Marl / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/49]For all designated states
HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-45764 Marl / DE
Former [1984/04]For all designated states
CHEMISCHE WERKE HÜLS AG
- RSP Patente / PB 15 -
D-45764 Marl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Burzin, Klaus, Dr.
Wellerfeldweg 164
D-4370 Marl / DE
02 / Bartmann, Martin, Dr.
Burgstrasse 35
D-4350 Recklinghausen / DE
03 / Bax, Hanns-Jörg, Dr.
Lipper Weg 193
D-4370 Marl / DE
04 / Ribbing, Wilfried, Dr.
Heesternweg 20
D-4270 Dorsten 12 / DE
[1984/04]
Application number, filing date83104423.505.05.1983
[1984/04]
Priority number, dateDE1982322469202.07.1982         Original published format: DE 3224692
[1984/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0098929
Date:25.01.1984
Language:DE
[1984/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0098929
Date:05.02.1986
Language:DE
[1986/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1983
ClassificationIPC:C08G65/44
[1984/04]
CPC:
C08G65/44 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1984/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyphenylenoxiden[1984/04]
English:Process for preparing polyphenylene oxides[1984/04]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de poly(oxydes de phénylène)[1984/04]
Examination procedure12.01.1984Examination requested  [1984/13]
15.03.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.07.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1985Fee for grant paid
10.09.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1668868  (BASF AG);
 [AD]DE2228071  (GEN ELECTRIC);
 [A]DE1595046  ;
 [A]DD108564  ;
 [A]EP0047428  (BASF AG [DE]);
 [AP]EP0071081  (BASF AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.